WI AB26 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 41-0)
Status: Failed on May 12 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-12 - Failed to pass notwithstanding the objections of the Governor pursuant to Joint Rule 82
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 41-0)
Status: Failed on May 12 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-12 - Failed to pass notwithstanding the objections of the Governor pursuant to Joint Rule 82
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 146.78 and 600.01 (1) (b) 13. of the statutes; Relating to: direct primary care agreements.
Title
Direct primary care agreements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Refused to reconsider vote by which Assembly Bill 26 was concurred in offered by Senator Fitzgerald (Y: 12 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Concurred in (Y: 20 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Move to call the question (Y: 19 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Ordered to a third reading (Y: 19 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Move to call the question (Y: 19 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Senate Amendment 1 laid on table (Y: 19 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Senate Amendment 1 laid on table (Y: 19 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and passed (Y: 61 N: 36 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - House - Assembly: Assembly Amendment 2 adopted (Y: 61 N: 36 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Concurred in (Y: 20 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Move to call the question (Y: 19 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Ordered to a third reading (Y: 19 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Move to call the question (Y: 19 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Senate Amendment 1 laid on table (Y: 19 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Senate Amendment 1 laid on table (Y: 19 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and passed (Y: 61 N: 36 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - House - Assembly: Assembly Amendment 2 adopted (Y: 61 N: 36 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-12 | House | Failed to pass notwithstanding the objections of the Governor pursuant to Joint Rule 82 |
2020-05-12 | House | Placed on calendar 5-12-2020 pursuant to Joint Rule 82 (2)(a) |
2020-02-28 | House | Report vetoed by the Governor on 2-28-2020 |
2020-02-25 | House | Presented to the Governor on 2-25-2020 |
2020-02-25 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 2-25-2020 |
2020-02-25 | House | LRB correction (Assembly Amendment 2) |
2020-02-20 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Messaged |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Refused to reconsider vote by which Assembly Bill 26 was concurred in offered by Senator Fitzgerald, Ayes 12, Noes 21 |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Move to call the question |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Concurred in, Ayes 20, Noes 13 |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Move to call the question, Ayes 19, Noes 14 |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Read a third time |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading, Ayes 19, Noes 14 |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Move to call the question, Ayes 19, Noes 14 |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 laid on table, Ayes 19, Noes 14 |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 laid on table, Ayes 19, Noes 14 |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Read a second time |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Senate Amendment 2 offered by Senators Carpenter, Ringhand, L. Taylor, Risser and Johnson |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senators Hansen, Shilling, Bewley, Miller, Risser, Erpenbach, Carpenter, Larson and Ringhand |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Placed on calendar 2-19-2020 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2020-01-21 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2020-01-21 | House | Representative Petryk added as a coauthor |
2020-01-21 | House | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 61, Noes 36 |
2020-01-21 | House | Rules suspended |
2020-01-21 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2020-01-21 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 adopted, Ayes 61, Noes 36 |
2020-01-21 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 offered by Representative Sanfelippo |
2020-01-21 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 adopted |
2020-01-21 | House | Read a second time |
2020-01-16 | House | Placed on calendar 1-21-2020 by Committee on Rules |
2020-01-16 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2020-01-16 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Small Business Development, Ayes 13, Noes 1 |
2020-01-16 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Small Business Development, Ayes 14, Noes 0 |
2019-10-02 | House | Executive action taken |
2019-09-24 | House | Representative Allen withdrawn as a coauthor |
2019-09-20 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representatives Sargent and Sanfelippo |
2019-09-10 | House | Representative Allen added as a coauthor |
2019-09-04 | House | Representative Edming added as a coauthor |
2019-09-04 | House | Public hearing held |
2019-04-11 | House | Representative James added as a coauthor |
2019-02-19 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Small Business Development |
2019-02-19 | House | Introduced |