WI AB26 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 15-1)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 15-1)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 71.775 (4) (a) 1. and 71.775 (4) (a) 2.; to renumber and amend 71.775 (4) (a) (intro.); to amend 71.20 (1), 71.24 (1), 71.24 (9) (a), 71.29 (8) (a), 71.44 (1) (a), 71.44 (4) (b), 71.84 (2) (a) and 71.84 (2) (c); and to create 71.775 (4) (fm) 3. of the statutes; Relating to: due dates for filing income and franchise tax returns, paying estimated income and franchise tax installment payments, and filing withholding tax returns. (FE)
Title
Due dates for filing income and franchise tax returns, paying estimated income and franchise tax installment payments, and filing withholding tax returns. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2017-03-07 | House | Laid on the table |
2017-03-01 | House | Placed on calendar 3-7-2017 by Committee on Rules |
2017-02-27 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2017-02-27 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Ways and Means, Ayes 12, Noes 0 |
2017-02-27 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Ways and Means, Ayes 12, Noes 0 |
2017-02-23 | House | Executive action taken |
2017-01-26 | House | Public hearing held |
2017-01-23 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Kooyenga |
2017-01-23 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-01-23 | House | Representative Spiros added as a coauthor |
2017-01-18 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2017-01-18 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2017/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab26 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2017/REG/AB26.pdf |