WI AB26 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 450.03 (1) (e), 450.08 (2) (b) and 450.11 (3); and to create 440.08 (2) (a) 38h. and 450.076 of the statutes; Relating to: licensure of home medical oxygen providers, providing an exemption from emergency rule procedures, and granting rule-making authority. (FE)
Title
Licensure of home medical oxygen providers, providing an exemption from emergency rule procedures, and granting rule-making authority. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2015-03-17 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2015-03-17 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Health, Ayes 12, Noes 0 |
2015-03-17 | House | Executive action taken |
2015-03-11 | House | Public hearing held |
2015-02-24 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-02-09 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Health |
2015-02-09 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2015/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab26 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2015/REG/AB26.pdf |