WI AB259 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 38-0)
Status: Introduced on May 8 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-11-14 - Representative Subeck added as a coauthor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 8 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-11-14 - Representative Subeck added as a coauthor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 49.688 (3m) of the statutes; Relating to: 100-day prescription drug supplies under SeniorCare and amending an administrative rule related to 100-day prescription drug supplies permitted under SeniorCare. (FE)
Title
100-day prescription drug supplies under SeniorCare and amending an administrative rule related to 100-day prescription drug supplies permitted under SeniorCare. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-11-14 | House | Representative Subeck added as a coauthor |
2023-11-14 | House | Laid on the table |
2023-11-13 | House | Representative Gustafson added as a coauthor |
2023-11-09 | House | Placed on calendar 11-14-2023 by Committee on Rules |
2023-11-09 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2023-11-09 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Health, Aging and Long-Term Care, Ayes 15, Noes 0 |
2023-11-09 | House | Executive action taken |
2023-10-10 | House | Public hearing held |
2023-07-19 | House | Senator Knodl added as a cosponsor |
2023-05-31 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2023-05-08 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Health, Aging and Long-Term Care |
2023-05-08 | House | Introduced |