WI AB258 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 66.0401 (1m) (intro.) and 76.28 (1) (e) (intro.); and to create 66.0401 (1e) (bd), 66.0401 (1e) (bm), 66.0401 (1s), 196.01 (5) (b) 8. and 196.376 of the statutes; Relating to: authorizing community solar programs and granting rule-making authority. (FE)
Title
Authorizing community solar programs and granting rule-making authority. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2024-02-14 | House | Public hearing held |
2023-05-19 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2023-05-17 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2023-05-08 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Energy and Utilities |
2023-05-08 | House | Introduced |