WI AB258 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-5)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-5)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 134.985 of the statutes; Relating to: removal of certain criminal record information from Internet sites without a fee and providing a criminal penalty. (FE)
Title
Removal of certain criminal record information from Internet sites without a fee and providing a criminal penalty. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2015-07-28 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Knodl |
2015-07-06 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-06-15 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-06-12 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-06-05 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety |
2015-06-05 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2015/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab258 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2015/REG/AB258.pdf |