WI AB252 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 26-10)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 26-10)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 450.035 (2g) of the statutes; Relating to: administration of vaccines by pharmacy students.
Title
Administration of vaccines by pharmacy students.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2017-06-14 | House | Laid on the table |
2017-06-14 | House | Representative Barca added as a coauthor |
2017-06-07 | House | Placed on calendar 6-14-2017 by Committee on Rules |
2017-05-19 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2017-05-19 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Health, Ayes 12, Noes 0 |
2017-05-17 | House | Executive action taken |
2017-04-26 | House | Public hearing held |
2017-04-14 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Health |
2017-04-14 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2017/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab252 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2017/REG/AB252.pdf |