WI AB252 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 939.74 (2d) (c); and to create 939.74 (2) (ar) of the statutes; Relating to: statute of limitations for second-degree or third-degree sexual assault.
Title
Statute of limitations for second-degree or third-degree sexual assault.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2015-11-16 | House | Representative Shankland added as a coauthor |
2015-10-13 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2015-10-13 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Judiciary, Ayes 7, Noes 0 |
2015-10-01 | House | Executive action taken |
2015-09-28 | House | Representative Heaton added as a coauthor |
2015-09-17 | House | Public hearing held |
2015-06-04 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2015-06-04 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2015/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab252 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2015/REG/AB252.pdf |