WI AB250 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 134.65 (1m); to amend 71.78 (1), 71.78 (4) (b), 71.78 (5), 71.78 (6), 72.06, 77.61 (5) (b) 2., 77.61 (5) (c), 77.61 (5) (d), 78.80 (3), 125.04 (4), 139.11 (4) (a) (intro.), 139.38 (6), 139.44 (2), 139.44 (8) (a), (b) and (c), 139.82 (6), 227.52 (1), 565.17 (5) (a), 565.50 (2), 565.50 (3) and 946.82 (4); and to create 71.78 (1g), 71.78 (4) (v), 71.83 (6), 73.03 (51b), 77.61 (5) (am), 77.61 (5) (b) 15., 125.02 (1c), 125.04 (8m), 125.09 (8), 125.09 (9), 125.112, 125.12 (7), 134.65 (1g), 134.65 (1m) (a) 1., 2. and 3., 134.65 (1m) (b), 134.65 (2m), 134.65 (3m), 139.44 (2m), 139.44 (8) (d), 227.43 (1) (bt), 227.43 (3) (bt), 227.43 (4) (bt), 565.17 (5) (d) and 565.50 (4) of the statutes; Relating to: Department of Revenue enforcement and providing a penalty. (FE)
Title
Department of Revenue enforcement and providing a penalty. (FE)
Sponsors
Rep. John Spiros [R] | Rep. Dora Drake [D] | Rep. Clint Moses [R] | Rep. Kenneth Skowronski [R] |
Rep. Samba Baldeh [D] | Rep. Jodi Emerson [D] | Rep. Evan Goyke [D] | Rep. Kalan Haywood [D] |
Rep. John Macco [R] | Rep. Don Vruwink [D] | Rep. Tip McGuire [D] | Rep. Robert Wittke [R] |
Rep. Sue Conley [D] | Sen. Van Wanggaard [R] | Sen. Lena Taylor [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | Senate | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Placed on calendar 3-8-2022 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Report concurrence recommended by Committee on Financial Institutions and Revenue, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Financial Institutions and Revenue |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2022-02-23 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2022-02-23 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2022-02-23 | House | Rules suspended |
2022-02-23 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2022-02-23 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 2 adopted |
2022-02-23 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 2 adopted |
2022-02-23 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 2 withdrawn and returned to author |
2022-02-23 | House | Read a second time |
2022-02-22 | House | Made a special order of business at 8:06 AM on 2-23-2022 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 29 |
2022-02-10 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 2 offered by Representative Spiros |
2022-02-01 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2022-02-01 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on State Affairs, Ayes 13, Noes 0 |
2022-02-01 | House | Report Assembly Substitute Amendment 2 adoption recommended by Committee on State Affairs, Ayes 13, Noes 0 |
2022-01-28 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 2 offered by Representative Spiros |
2022-01-26 | House | Executive action taken |
2022-01-25 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 2 offered by Representative Spiros |
2022-01-19 | House | Public hearing held |
2021-10-26 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Spiros |
2021-06-03 | House | Representative Ohnstad added as a coauthor |
2021-05-14 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-04-15 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-04-08 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs |
2021-04-08 | House | Introduced |