WI AB25 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-03-24 - Available for scheduling
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to create 103.375 of the statutes; Relating to: prohibiting mandatory vaccination for employment.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibiting mandatory vaccination for employment.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-23 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and passed (Y: 59 N: 35 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-24SenateAvailable for scheduling
2021-03-24SenateRead first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization
2021-03-24SenateReceived from Assembly
2021-03-23HouseOrdered immediately messaged
2021-03-23HouseRead a third time and passed, Ayes 59, Noes 35, Paired 2
2021-03-23HouseRules suspended
2021-03-23HouseOrdered to a third reading
2021-03-23HouseAssembly Amendment 1 adopted
2021-03-23HouseRead a second time
2021-03-19HouseRepresentative Steffen added as a coauthor
2021-03-17HousePlaced on calendar 3-23-2021 by Committee on Rules
2021-03-17HouseReferred to committee on Rules
2021-03-17HouseReport passage as amended recommended by Committee on Constitution and Ethics, Ayes 6, Noes 3
2021-03-17HouseReport Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Constitution and Ethics, Ayes 6, Noes 3
2021-03-10HouseExecutive action taken
2021-03-09HouseAssembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Thiesfeldt
2021-03-08HouseRepresentative Cabral-Guevara added as a coauthor
2021-03-05HouseRepresentative Wichgers added as a coauthor
2021-03-04HouseRepresentative Allen added as a coauthor
2021-03-03HousePublic hearing held
2021-03-02HouseRepresentatives Loudenbeck and Plumer added as coauthors
2021-03-01HouseRepresentatives Edming and Tittl added as coauthors
2021-02-26HouseRepresentative Ramthun added as a coauthor
2021-01-29HouseRead first time and referred to Committee on Constitution and Ethics
2021-01-29HouseIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback