WI AB25 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 20-7)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-08 - Referred to committee on Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to amend 978.06 (5) (a); and to create 978.001 (1k) of the statutes; Relating to: allowing district attorneys, deputy district attorneys, and assistant district attorneys to engage in the private practice of law for certain civil purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Allowing district attorneys, deputy district attorneys, and assistant district attorneys to engage in the private practice of law for certain civil purposes.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-08HouseReferred to committee on Rules
2019-05-08HouseReport passage as amended recommended by Committee on Judiciary, Ayes 8, Noes 1
2019-05-08HouseReport Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Judiciary, Ayes 9, Noes 0
2019-04-11HouseExecutive action taken
2019-04-05HouseAssembly Amendment 1 offered by Representatives Horlacher and Hebl
2019-03-14HousePublic hearing held
2019-02-19HouseRead first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary
2019-02-19HouseIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback