WI AB25 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 41-5)
Status: Passed on June 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-21 - Published 6-22-2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 41-5)
Status: Passed on June 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-21 - Published 6-22-2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 103.19, 103.70 (2) (c) and 103.71 (1) (a) and (b); to renumber and amend 103.71 (1) (intro.); to amend 20.445 (1) (gk), 103.005 (14) (a), 103.25 (1), 103.25 (3), 103.27 (2), 103.28 (2), 103.64 (3), 103.70 (1), 103.70 (2) (a), 103.70 (2) (b) (intro.), 103.73 (3), 103.74 (intro.), 103.74 (1), 103.75 (1), 103.76, 103.80 (2), 103.81 (1), 103.81 (2), 118.56 (3) (a), 120.13 (34) and 948.015 (1); to repeal and recreate 103.20; and to create 103.81 (2m) of the statutes; Relating to: child labor permits and modifying references to child labor in the statutes. (FE)
Title
Child labor permits and modifying references to child labor in the statutes. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-10 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and concurred in (Y: 20 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - Senate - Senate: Senate Amendment 2 rejected (Y: 20 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - Senate - Senate: Senate Amendment 1 rejected (Y: 20 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - Senate - Senate: Senate Substitute Amendment 2 rejected (Y: 20 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - Senate - Senate: Senate Substitute Amendment 1 rejected (Y: 20 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and passed (Y: 64 N: 34 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - House - Assembly: Assembly Amendment 3 laid on table (Y: 64 N: 34 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - House - Assembly: Assembly Amendment 2 laid on table (Y: 65 N: 33 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - Senate - Senate: Senate Amendment 2 rejected (Y: 20 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - Senate - Senate: Senate Amendment 1 rejected (Y: 20 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - Senate - Senate: Senate Substitute Amendment 2 rejected (Y: 20 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - Senate - Senate: Senate Substitute Amendment 1 rejected (Y: 20 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and passed (Y: 64 N: 34 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - House - Assembly: Assembly Amendment 3 laid on table (Y: 64 N: 34 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - House - Assembly: Assembly Amendment 2 laid on table (Y: 65 N: 33 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-21 | House | Published 6-22-2017 |
2017-06-21 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 6-21-2017. 2017 Wisconsin Act 11 |
2017-06-20 | House | Presented to the Governor on 6-20-2017 |
2017-05-23 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 5-23-2017 |
2017-05-10 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 20, Noes 12 |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Senate Amendment 2 rejected, Ayes 20, Noes 12 |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 rejected, Ayes 20, Noes 12 |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Senate Substitute Amendment 2 rejected, Ayes 20, Noes 12 |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Senate Substitute Amendment 1 rejected, Ayes 20, Noes 11 |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Read a second time |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Senate Substitute Amendment 2 offered by Senator L. Taylor |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Senate Amendment 2 offered by Senators Johnson, Vinehout, L. Taylor, Hansen, Wirch, Bewley, Shilling, Miller, Ringhand, Risser, Carpenter and Erpenbach |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senators Johnson, Vinehout, L. Taylor, Hansen, Wirch, Bewley, Shilling, Miller, Ringhand, Risser, Carpenter and Erpenbach |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Senate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senators Johnson, Vinehout, L. Taylor, Hansen, Wirch, Bewley, Shilling, Miller, Ringhand, Risser, Carpenter and Erpenbach |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Placed on calendar 5-10-2017 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2017-05-02 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2017-05-02 | House | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 64, Noes 34 |
2017-05-02 | House | Rules suspended |
2017-05-02 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2017-05-02 | House | Assembly Amendment 3 laid on table, Ayes 64, Noes 34 |
2017-05-02 | House | Assembly Amendment 3 offered by Representative Sinicki |
2017-05-02 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 laid on table, Ayes 65, Noes 33 |
2017-05-02 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 offered by Representatives Ohnstad and Sinicki |
2017-05-02 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 adopted |
2017-05-02 | House | Read a second time |
2017-04-27 | House | Placed on calendar 5-2-2017 by Committee on Rules |
2017-04-04 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2017-04-04 | House | Report passage as amended, with emergency statement attached, pursuant to s.16.47 (2), Wisconsin Statutes, recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 12, Noes 4 |
2017-04-04 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 16, Noes 0 |
2017-03-27 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Joint Committee on Finance |
2017-03-27 | House | Executive action taken |
2017-03-10 | House | Emergency statement attached by Governor pursuant to s. 16.47(2), Wisconsin Statutes |
2017-03-07 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-03-01 | House | Withdrawn from committee on Rules and referred to joint committee on Finance pursuant to Assembly Rule 24 (3)(a) |
2017-02-27 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2017-02-27 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Labor, Ayes 6, Noes 3 |
2017-02-27 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Labor, Ayes 9, Noes 0 |
2017-02-22 | House | Executive action taken |
2017-02-21 | House | Representative C. Taylor withdrawn as a coauthor |
2017-02-10 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-02-09 | House | Public hearing held |
2017-02-09 | House | Representatives Bowen, Doyle, Milroy and Ohnstad withdrawn as coauthors |
2017-02-09 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-02-02 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Loudenbeck |
2017-01-31 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-01-30 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-01-30 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-01-26 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-01-18 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Labor |
2017-01-18 | House | Introduced |