WI AB25 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 27-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-31 - Published 3-31-2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 27-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-31 - Published 3-31-2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 285.27 (5) of the statutes; Relating to: regulating air pollution from residential and commercial wood heaters. (FE)
Title
Regulating air pollution from residential and commercial wood heaters. (FE)
Sponsors
Sen. David Craig [R] | Sen. Mary Felzkowski [R] | Rep. Mark Born [R] | Rep. Janel Brandtjen [R] |
Rep. Ed Brooks [R] | Sen. Rob Hutton [R] | Sen. Andre Jacque [R] | Rep. Adam Jarchow [R] |
Rep. Joel Kleefisch [R] | Sen. Dan Knodl [R] | Rep. Dean Knudson [R] | Sen. Dale Kooyenga [R] |
Rep. Jesse Kremer [R] | Rep. Scott Krug [R] | Rep. Robert Kulp [R] | Rep. Tom Larson [R] |
Rep. Jeffrey Mursau [R] | Rep. Alvin Ott [R] | Rep. Joe Sanfelippo [R] | Rep. Rob Swearingen [R] |
Rep. Jeremy Thiesfeldt [R] | Rep. Paul Tittl [R] | Sen. Frank Lasee [R] | Sen. Mary Lazich [R] |
Sen. Steve Nass [R] | Sen. Roger Roth [R] | Sen. Thomas Tiffany [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-15 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and concurred in (Y: 19 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-09 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and passed (Y: 63 N: 35 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-09 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and passed (Y: 63 N: 35 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-31 | House | Published 3-31-2016 |
2016-03-31 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 3-30-2016. 2015 Wisconsin Act 303 |
2016-03-29 | House | Presented to the Governor on 3-29-2016 |
2016-03-23 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 3-23-2016 |
2016-03-16 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 19, Noes 13 |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Read a second time |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Placed on calendar 3-15-2016 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2016-01-14 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2016-01-14 | Senate | Report concurrence recommended by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy, Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2016-01-13 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2015-06-12 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Natural Resources and Energy |
2015-06-10 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2015-06-09 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2015-06-09 | House | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 63, Noes 35 |
2015-06-09 | House | Rules suspended |
2015-06-09 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2015-06-09 | House | Read a second time |
2015-06-03 | House | Placed on calendar 6-9-2015 by Committee on Rules |
2015-06-02 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2015-06-02 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Environment and Forestry, Ayes 8, Noes 5 |
2015-05-27 | House | Executive action taken |
2015-02-19 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-02-19 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-02-17 | House | Public hearing held |
2015-02-17 | House | Representative R. Brooks added as a coauthor |
2015-02-05 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Environment and Forestry |
2015-02-05 | House | Introduced |