WI AB248 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-4)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-4)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 192.32 (1) (c) of the statutes; Relating to: pedestrians crossing railroads.
Title
Pedestrians crossing railroads.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2021-04-27 | House | Senator Marklein added as a cosponsor |
2021-04-27 | House | Public hearing held |
2021-04-13 | House | Representative Bowen added as a coauthor |
2021-04-08 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation |
2021-04-08 | House | Introduced |