WI AB246 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Engrossed on November 1 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-23 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on November 1 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-23 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 946.415 (2) (a); to consolidate, renumber and amend 946.415 (2) (intro.), (b) and (c); and to amend 946.415 (title) of the statutes; relating to: resisting officer while armed with or threatening to use a dangerous weapon.
Title
Resisting officer while armed with or threatening to use a dangerous weapon.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Krug [R] | Sen. Andre Jacque [R] | Rep. Penny Schaber [D] | Rep. Ed Brooks [R] |
Rep. Michael Endsley [R] | Rep. Samantha Kerkman [R] | Rep. Keith Ripp [R] | Rep. Richard Spanbauer [R] |
Rep. Josh Zepnick [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-23 | Senate | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2011-11-02 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Labor, Public Safety, and Urban Affairs |
2011-11-02 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2011-11-01 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2011-11-01 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2011-11-01 | House | Rules suspended |
2011-11-01 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2011-11-01 | House | Read a second time |
2011-10-27 | House | Placed on calendar 11-1-2011 by committee on Rules |
2011-10-25 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2011-10-25 | House | Report passage recommended by committee on Criminal Justice and Corrections, Ayes 9, Noes 0 |
2011-10-19 | House | Executive action taken |
2011-10-06 | House | Public hearing held |
2011-09-07 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Criminal Justice and Corrections |
2011-09-07 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2011/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab246 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2011/REG/AB246.pdf |