WI AB245 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 5.06 (10); to renumber and amend 5.06 (1); to amend 5.06 (4), 5.06 (7), 5.15 (4) (a), 5.60 (3) (ag), 5.62 (1) (a), 5.94, 6.45 (1), 6.46 (2), 6.47 (1) (ag), 6.47 (1) (dm), 7.08 (10), 7.23 (1) (e), 7.50 (2) (em), 7.52 (1) (b), 7.60 (5) (a), 9.01 (2), 10.01 (1), 10.06 (2) (d), 10.06 (2) (f), 10.06 (2) (j), 10.06 (2) (L), 10.06 (3) (as), 10.06 (3) (b), 10.06 (3) (c) and 10.06 (3) (d); and to create 5.06 (1) (b) and 9.10 (2) (e) 9. of the statutes; Relating to: elections administration, recall petitions, and recount procedures. (FE)
Title
Elections administration, recall petitions, and recount procedures. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2020-02-20 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2020-02-20 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2020-02-20 | House | Rules suspended |
2020-02-20 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2020-02-20 | House | Read a second time |
2020-02-18 | House | Made a special order of business at 10:04 AM on 2-20-2020 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 21 |
2020-02-18 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2020-02-18 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Campaigns and Elections, Ayes 7, Noes 2 |
2019-09-10 | House | Executive action taken |
2019-06-19 | House | Representative Considine added as a coauthor |
2019-05-30 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-05-29 | House | Public hearing held |
2019-05-24 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Campaigns and Elections |
2019-05-24 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab245 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/AB245.pdf |