WI AB241 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 66.0137 (4m) (a); to renumber and amend 66.0137 (1) (ae); to amend 20.835 (1) (db), 66.0137 (3), 66.0137 (5) (c) 1., 66.0137 (5) (c) 2., 66.0137 (5) (c) 3. (intro.), 66.0137 (5) (c) 3. b., 79.01 (2d) and 79.035 (5); and to create 16.14, 20.505 (1) (cr), 66.0137 (1) (af), 66.0137 (1) (ag), 66.0137 (1) (am), 66.0137 (1) (ap), 66.0137 (1) (c), 66.0137 (5) (c) 1m., 66.0137 (5) (c) 4. and 79.035 (6) of the statutes; Relating to: requiring the payment of health insurance premiums, and establishing a loan program, for survivors of a law enforcement officer, emergency medical technician, or fire fighter who dies, or has died, in the line of duty and making appropriations. (FE)
Title
Requiring the payment of health insurance premiums, and establishing a loan program, for survivors of a law enforcement officer, emergency medical technician, or fire fighter who dies, or has died, in the line of duty and making appropriations. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-08 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2013-07-03 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2013-06-26 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2013-06-11 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Labor |
2013-06-11 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2013/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab241 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2013/REG/AB241.pdf |