WI AB240 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 452.09 (3) (d); and to create 452.09 (4) of the statutes; Relating to: experience requirements for real estate brokers and granting rule-making authority.
Title
Experience requirements for real estate brokers and granting rule-making authority.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-08 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2013-11-12 | House | Laid on the table |
2013-11-12 | House | Representative Wright added as a coauthor |
2013-11-11 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representatives Nass and Steineke |
2013-11-07 | House | Placed on calendar 11-12-2013 by Committee on Rules |
2013-11-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2013-11-07 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Housing and Real Estate, Ayes 7, Noes 2 |
2013-11-07 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Housing and Real Estate, Ayes 9, Noes 0 |
2013-11-07 | House | Executive action taken |
2013-10-31 | House | Public hearing held |
2013-09-24 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Steineke |
2013-06-06 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Housing and Real Estate |
2013-06-06 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2013/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab240 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2013/REG/AB240.pdf |