WI AB24 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 19-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 15 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-05-06 - Placed on calendar 5-11-2021 by Committee on Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to create 252.03 (2g) of the statutes; Relating to: closure of and forbidding gatherings in places of worship.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Closure of and forbidding gatherings in places of worship.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-23 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and passed (Y: 61 N: 33 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-06HousePlaced on calendar 5-11-2021 by Committee on Rules
2021-05-06HouseReferred to committee on Rules
2021-04-23HouseReport vetoed by the Governor on 4-23-2021
2021-04-21HousePresented to the Governor on 4-21-2021 by directive of the Speaker
2021-04-15HouseReport correctly enrolled on 4-15-2021
2021-04-14HouseReceived from Senate concurred in
2021-04-14SenateOrdered immediately messaged
2021-04-14SenateRead a third time and concurred in
2021-04-14SenateRules suspended
2021-04-14SenateOrdered to a third reading
2021-04-14SenateRead a second time
2021-04-13SenatePlaced on calendar 4-14-2021 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
2021-04-13SenatePublic hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 3, Noes 2
2021-03-24SenateAvailable for scheduling
2021-03-24SenateRead first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization
2021-03-23SenateReceived from Assembly
2021-03-23HouseOrdered immediately messaged
2021-03-23HouseRead a third time and passed, Ayes 61, Noes 33, Paired 2
2021-03-23HouseRules suspended
2021-03-23HouseOrdered to a third reading
2021-03-23HouseAssembly Substitute Amendment 1 adopted
2021-03-23HouseRead a second time
2021-03-19HouseRepresentative Steffen added as a coauthor
2021-03-17HousePlaced on calendar 3-23-2021 by Committee on Rules
2021-03-17HouseReferred to committee on Rules
2021-03-17HouseReport passage as amended recommended by Committee on Constitution and Ethics, Ayes 6, Noes 3
2021-03-17HouseReport Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Constitution and Ethics, Ayes 6, Noes 3
2021-03-10HouseExecutive action taken
2021-03-09HouseAssembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Thiesfeldt
2021-03-05HouseRepresentative Wichgers added as a coauthor
2021-03-04HouseRepresentative Allen added as a coauthor
2021-03-03HouseRepresentative Tittl added as a coauthor
2021-03-03HousePublic hearing held
2021-03-02HouseRepresentative Plumer added as a coauthor
2021-03-01HouseRepresentative Edming added as a coauthor
2021-02-26HouseRepresentative Ramthun added as a coauthor
2021-01-29HouseRead first time and referred to Committee on Constitution and Ethics
2021-01-29HouseIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback