WI AB24 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 50-6)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to create 632.866 of the statutes; Relating to: step therapy protocols for prescription drug coverage and requiring the exercise of rule-making authority.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Step therapy protocols for prescription drug coverage and requiring the exercise of rule-making authority.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-01HouseFailed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
2019-06-18HouseLaid on the table
2019-06-13HousePlaced on calendar 6-18-2019 by Committee on Rules
2019-06-12HouseReferred to committee on Rules
2019-06-12HouseReport passage as amended recommended by Committee on Health, Ayes 13, Noes 0
2019-06-12HouseReport Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Health, Ayes 13, Noes 0
2019-05-09HouseExecutive action taken
2019-04-17HousePublic hearing held
2019-04-17HouseSenator Bewley added as a cosponsor
2019-04-11HouseRepresentative James added as a coauthor
2019-03-27HouseRepresentative Ohnstad added as a coauthor
2019-03-26HouseAssembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Nygren
2019-03-07HouseRepresentative Sinicki added as a coauthor
2019-02-12HouseRead first time and referred to Committee on Health
2019-02-12HouseIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback