WI AB24 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 21-1)
Status: Passed on July 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-01 - Published 7-2-2015
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 21-1)
Status: Passed on July 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-01 - Published 7-2-2015
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 138.056 (2) (intro.) and 138.056 (2) (b); and to create 138.056 (2m) of the statutes; Relating to: variable rate loans.
Title
Variable rate loans.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-01 | House | Published 7-2-2015 |
2015-07-01 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 7-1-2015. 2015 Wisconsin Act 54 |
2015-06-30 | House | Presented to the Governor on 6-30-2015 |
2015-06-15 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 6-15-2015 |
2015-06-09 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2015-06-09 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2015-06-09 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in |
2015-06-09 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2015-06-09 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2015-06-09 | Senate | Read a second time |
2015-06-08 | Senate | Placed on calendar 6-9-2015 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Report concurrence recommended by Committee on Revenue, Financial Institutions, and Rural Issues, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2015-06-03 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Revenue, Financial Institutions, and Rural Issues |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2015-04-14 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2015-04-14 | House | Representatives Kahl, Barca and Genrich added as coauthors |
2015-04-14 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2015-04-14 | House | Rules suspended |
2015-04-14 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2015-04-14 | House | Read a second time |
2015-04-09 | House | Placed on calendar 4-14-2015 by Committee on Rules |
2015-03-24 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2015-03-24 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Financial Institutions, Ayes 13, Noes 3 |
2015-03-19 | House | Executive action taken |
2015-02-11 | House | Public hearing held |
2015-02-05 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Financial Institutions |
2015-02-05 | House | Introduced |