WI AB24 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 13-3)
Status: Passed on April 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-02 - Published 4-3-2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 13-3)
Status: Passed on April 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-02 - Published 4-3-2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 5.90 (1) of the statutes; Relating to: the method of recounting votes cast with automatic tabulating equipment.
Title
The method of recounting votes cast with automatic tabulating equipment.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-02 | House | Published 4-3-2014 |
2014-04-02 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 4-2-2014. 2013 Wisconsin Act 176 |
2014-03-26 | House | Presented to the Governor on 3-26-2014 |
2014-03-18 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 3-18-2014 |
2014-03-12 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Read a second time |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Placed on calendar 3-11-2014 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2014-02-18 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2014-02-18 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2014-02-18 | House | Rules suspended |
2014-02-18 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2014-02-18 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 adopted |
2014-02-18 | House | Read a second time |
2014-02-18 | House | Rules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up |
2014-02-18 | House | Representative Wright added as a coauthor |
2014-02-13 | House | Placed on calendar 2-18-2014 by Committee on Rules |
2013-03-26 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2013-03-26 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Campaigns and Elections, Ayes 8, Noes 0 |
2013-03-26 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Campaigns and Elections, Ayes 8, Noes 0 |
2013-03-12 | House | Executive action taken |
2013-03-06 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Thiesfeldt |
2013-02-15 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Campaigns and Elections |
2013-02-15 | House | Introduced |