WI AB24 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-2)
Status: Failed on March 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-23 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-2)
Status: Failed on March 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-23 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 29.184 (9) (b); to renumber and amend 29.184 (8) and 29.184 (9) (a); to amend 29.184 (4), 29.184 (5) (a), 29.184 (5) (b), 29.971 (11m) (a) and 29.971 (11m) (b); and to create 29.184 (3) (br) 1m., 29.184 (3) (br) 4., 29.184 (3m), 29.184 (5) (c) and 29.184 (8) (b) of the statutes; relating to: privileges under a Class A or Class B bear hunting license, and bear carcass tag and back tag requirements. (FE)
Title
Privileges under a Class A or Class B bear hunting license, and bear carcass tag and back tag requirements. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-14 - House - Refused to suspend rules to read a third time (Y: 58 N: 37 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-14 - House - Assembly amendment 8 laid on table (Y: 59 N: 36 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-14 - House - Assembly amendment 7 laid on table (Y: 58 N: 37 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-14 - House - Assembly amendment 6 laid on table (Y: 59 N: 36 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-14 - House - Assembly amendment 5 laid on table (Y: 59 N: 36 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-14 - House - Refused to suspend rules to read a third time (Y: 58 N: 37 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-14 - House - Assembly amendment 8 laid on table (Y: 59 N: 36 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-14 - House - Assembly amendment 7 laid on table (Y: 58 N: 37 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-14 - House - Assembly amendment 6 laid on table (Y: 59 N: 36 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-14 - House - Assembly amendment 5 laid on table (Y: 59 N: 36 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-14 - House - Refused to suspend rules to read a third time (Y: 58 N: 37 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-23 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2011-05-11 | House | Laid on the table |
2011-05-10 | House | Made a special order of business at 10:04 A.M. on 5-11-2011 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 9 |
2011-04-14 | House | Representative Tranel added as a coauthor |
2011-04-14 | House | Refused to suspend rules to read a third time, Ayes 58, Noes 37 |
2011-04-14 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2011-04-14 | House | Assembly amendment 8 laid on table, Ayes 59, Noes 36 |
2011-04-14 | House | Assembly amendment 8 offered by Representatives Molepske Jr, Milroy and Danou |
2011-04-14 | House | Assembly amendment 7 laid on table, Ayes 58, Noes 37 |
2011-04-14 | House | Assembly amendment 7 offered by Representatives Milroy and Bewley |
2011-04-14 | House | Assembly amendment 6 laid on table, Ayes 59, Noes 36 |
2011-04-14 | House | Assembly amendment 5 laid on table, Ayes 59, Noes 36 |
2011-04-14 | House | Assembly amendment 4 adopted |
2011-04-14 | House | Assembly amendment 1 adopted |
2011-04-14 | House | Read a second time |
2011-04-13 | House | Assembly amendment 6 offered by Representative Milroy |
2011-04-13 | House | Assembly amendment 5 offered by Representative Milroy |
2011-04-12 | House | Placed on calendar 4-14-2011 by committee on Rules |
2011-04-07 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2011-04-07 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by committee on Natural Resources, Ayes 12, Noes 3 |
2011-04-07 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 4 adoption recommended by committee on Natural Resources, Ayes 15, Noes 0 |
2011-04-07 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by committee on Natural Resources, Ayes 15, Noes 0 |
2011-04-06 | House | Executive action taken |
2011-04-05 | House | Assembly amendment 4 offered by Representative Severson |
2011-04-04 | House | Assembly amendment 3 offered by Representative Milroy |
2011-04-04 | House | Assembly amendment 2 offered by Representative Milroy |
2011-04-01 | House | Assembly amendment 1 offered by Representative Severson |
2011-03-30 | House | Public hearing held |
2011-03-30 | House | Senator Schultz withdrawn as a cosponsor |
2011-03-11 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2011-02-17 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Natural Resources |
2011-02-17 | House | Introduced |