WI AB239 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Failed on March 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-23 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Failed on March 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-23 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 301.475 of the statutes; relating to: notification requirements for persons who must register as sex offenders and who are on school premises and providing penalties. (FE)
Title
Notification requirements for persons who must register as sex offenders and who are on school premises and providing penalties. (FE)
Sponsors
Rep. Joel Kleefisch [R] | Rep. Richard Spanbauer [R] | Rep. Alvin Ott [R] | Rep. Robert Turner [D] |
Rep. Joe Knilans [R] | Rep. Jeffrey Mursau [R] | Sen. Mary Lazich [R] | Sen. Van Wanggaard [R] |
Sen. Julie Lassa [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-23 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2011-10-24 | House | Assembly amendment 4 offered by Representative Kleefisch |
2011-10-20 | House | Assembly amendment 3 offered by Representative Kleefisch |
2011-10-19 | House | Public hearing held |
2011-10-19 | House | Assembly amendment 2 offered by Representative Kleefisch |
2011-10-18 | House | Assembly amendment 1 offered by Representative Kleefisch |
2011-09-27 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2011-09-13 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2011-09-13 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2011-09-07 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2011-08-30 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Criminal Justice and Corrections |
2011-08-30 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2011/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab239 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2011/REG/AB239.pdf |