WI AB238 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 21-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 21-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating to: work requirements for recipients of vouchers under the federal Housing Choice Voucher Program. (FE)
Title
Work requirements for recipients of vouchers under the federal Housing Choice Voucher Program. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-10 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and passed (Y: 61 N: 35 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - House - Assembly: Assembly Amendment 7 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 laid on table (Y: 61 N: 35 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - House - Assembly: Assembly Amendment 6 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 laid on table (Y: 61 N: 35 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - House - Assembly: Assembly Amendment 5 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 laid on table (Y: 61 N: 35 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - House - Assembly: Assembly Amendment 4 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 laid on table (Y: 61 N: 35 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - House - Assembly: Assembly Amendment 7 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 laid on table (Y: 61 N: 35 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - House - Assembly: Assembly Amendment 6 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 laid on table (Y: 61 N: 35 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - House - Assembly: Assembly Amendment 5 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 laid on table (Y: 61 N: 35 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - House - Assembly: Assembly Amendment 4 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 laid on table (Y: 61 N: 35 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | Senate | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2017-05-10 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2017-05-10 | House | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 61, Noes 35 |
2017-05-10 | House | Rules suspended |
2017-05-10 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2017-05-10 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adopted |
2017-05-10 | House | Assembly Amendment 7 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 laid on table, Ayes 61, Noes 35 |
2017-05-10 | House | Assembly Amendment 7 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representatives Riemer, Anderson, Berceau, Bowen, Brostoff, Hebl, Hesselbein, Pope, Sargent, Sinicki, Spreitzer, Subeck, Vruwink and Wachs |
2017-05-10 | House | Assembly Amendment 6 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 laid on table, Ayes 61, Noes 35 |
2017-05-10 | House | Assembly Amendment 6 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representatives Subeck, Anderson, Berceau, Bowen, Brostoff, Hebl, Hesselbein, Pope, Sargent, Sinicki, Spreitzer, Vruwink and Wachs |
2017-05-10 | House | Assembly Amendment 5 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 laid on table, Ayes 61, Noes 35 |
2017-05-10 | House | Assembly Amendment 5 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representatives Subeck, Anderson, Berceau, Bowen, Brostoff, Hebl, Hesselbein, Pope, Sargent, Sinicki, Spreitzer, Vruwink and Wachs |
2017-05-10 | House | Assembly Amendment 4 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 laid on table, Ayes 61, Noes 35 |
2017-05-10 | House | Assembly Amendment 4 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representatives Subeck, Anderson, Berceau, Bowen, Brostoff, Hebl, Hesselbein, Pope, Sargent, Sinicki, Spreitzer, Vruwink and Wachs |
2017-05-10 | House | Read a second time |
2017-05-04 | House | Placed on calendar 5-10-2017 by Committee on Rules |
2017-04-25 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2017-04-25 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Public Benefit Reform, Ayes 5, Noes 3 |
2017-04-25 | House | Report Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Public Benefit Reform, Ayes 5, Noes 3 |
2017-04-20 | House | Executive action taken |
2017-04-19 | House | Assembly Amendment 3 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Subeck |
2017-04-19 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Subeck |
2017-04-19 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Riemer |
2017-04-18 | House | Public hearing held |
2017-04-17 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Katsma |
2017-04-17 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-04-13 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Public Benefit Reform |
2017-04-13 | House | Introduced |