WI AB235 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 38.24 (3) (a); and to create 38.24 (3m) of the statutes; Relating to: charging resident fees to nonresident veterans and their family members attending technical colleges. (FE)
Title
Charging resident fees to nonresident veterans and their family members attending technical colleges. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2015-05-28 | House | Public hearing held |
2015-05-27 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-05-20 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-05-20 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Skowronski |
2015-05-20 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Colleges and Universities |
2015-05-20 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2015/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab235 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2015/REG/AB235.pdf |