WI AB234 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Introduced on April 28 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-18 - Representative Andraca added as a coauthor
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 28 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-18 - Representative Andraca added as a coauthor
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 20.235 (1) (cp) and 39.396 of the statutes; Relating to: a school psychologist loan program, and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
A school psychologist loan program, and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-18 | House | Representative Andraca added as a coauthor |
2024-01-18 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2024-01-18 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Education, Ayes 13, Noes 0 |
2024-01-18 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 2 adoption recommended by Committee on Education, Ayes 13, Noes 0 |
2023-12-08 | House | Representative Ratcliff added as a coauthor |
2023-11-09 | House | Representative Emerson added as a coauthor |
2023-11-06 | House | Representative Joers added as a coauthor |
2023-11-01 | House | Executive action taken |
2023-10-30 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 offered by Representative Sortwell |
2023-10-26 | House | Public hearing held |
2023-05-17 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2023-05-01 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Sortwell |
2023-04-28 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Education |
2023-04-28 | House | Introduced |