WI AB232 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 19-6)
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-08 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-08 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 20.435 (4) (bm), 20.435 (4) (L), 20.435 (4) (nn), 20.435 (4) (pa), 20.437 (2) (dz), 20.437 (2) (L) and 49.793 (2) (a); and to create 49.846 of the statutes; Relating to: an optional incentive program for counties and tribes that identify fraudulent activity in certain public assistance programs, granting rule-making authority, and making appropriations. (FE)
Title
An optional incentive program for counties and tribes that identify fraudulent activity in certain public assistance programs, granting rule-making authority, and making appropriations. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-08 | Senate | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2014-03-24 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Health and Human Services |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2014-03-20 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2014-03-20 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2014-03-20 | House | Rules suspended |
2014-03-20 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2014-03-20 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adopted |
2014-03-20 | House | Read a second time |
2014-03-18 | House | Made a special order of business at 10:04 AM on 3-20-2014 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 28 |
2014-03-18 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2014-03-18 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Urban and Local Affairs, Ayes 9, Noes 0 |
2014-03-18 | House | Report Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Urban and Local Affairs, Ayes 9, Noes 0 |
2014-03-11 | House | Executive action taken |
2014-02-24 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Weininger |
2013-12-17 | House | Public hearing held |
2013-12-17 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2013-07-03 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2013-06-04 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Urban and Local Affairs |
2013-06-04 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2013/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab232 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2013/REG/AB232.pdf |