WI AB232 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-6)
Status: Passed on April 13 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-17 - Published 4-26-2012
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to renumber 950.04 (1v) (a); and to create 950.04 (1v) (ag), 950.04 (1v) (dr) and 950.105 of the statutes; relating to: rights of crime victims and witnesses.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Rights of crime victims and witnesses.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-10-20 - House - Assembly: Assembly amendment 4 laid on table (Y: 60 N: 36 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-04-17HousePublished 4-26-2012
2012-04-13HouseReport approved by the Governor on 4-12-2012. 2011 Wisconsin Act 283
2012-04-05HousePresented to the Governor on 4-5-2012
2012-03-27HouseReport correctly enrolled
2012-03-15HouseAction ordered immediately messaged
2012-03-15HouseSenate amendment 1 concurred in
2012-03-13HouseMade a special order of business at 9:03 A.M. on 3-14-2012 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 24
2012-03-13HouseReferred to committee on Rules
2012-03-13HouseReceived from Senate amended and concurred in as amended (Senate amendment 1 adopted)
2012-03-13SenateOrdered immediately messaged
2012-03-13SenateRead a third time and concurred in as amended
2012-03-13SenateRules suspended
2012-03-13SenateOrdered to a third reading
2012-03-13SenateSenate amendment 1 adopted
2012-03-13SenateRead a second time
2012-03-12SenatePlaced on calendar 3-13-2012 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
2012-03-12SenateAvailable for scheduling
2012-03-12SenateReport concurrence as amended recommended by committee on Judiciary, Utilities, Commerce, and Government Operations, Ayes 5, Noes 0
2012-03-12SenateReport adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by committee on Judiciary, Utilities, Commerce, and Government Operations, Ayes 3, Noes 2
2012-03-12SenateExecutive action taken
2012-03-08SenateSenate amendment 1 offered by Senator Wanggaard
2012-02-28SenatePublic hearing held
2011-10-21SenateRead first time and referred to committee on Judiciary, Utilities, Commerce, and Government Operations
2011-10-21SenateReceived from Assembly
2011-10-20HouseOrdered immediately messaged
2011-10-20HouseRead a third time and passed
2011-10-20HouseRules suspended
2011-10-20HouseOrdered to a third reading
2011-10-20HouseAssembly amendment 4 laid on table, Ayes 60, Noes 36
2011-10-20HouseAssembly amendment 4 offered by Representative Molepske Jr
2011-10-20HouseAssembly amendment 1 adopted
2011-10-20HouseRead a second time
2011-10-18HousePlaced on calendar 10-20-2011 by committee on Rules
2011-09-28HouseReferred to committee on Rules
2011-09-28HouseReport passage as amended recommended by committee on Criminal Justice and Corrections, Ayes 8, Noes 1
2011-09-28HouseReport Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by committee on Criminal Justice and Corrections, Ayes 9, Noes 0
2011-09-22HouseExecutive action taken
2011-09-21HouseAssembly amendment 3 offered by Representative Kessler
2011-09-21HouseAssembly amendment 2 offered by Representative Kessler
2011-09-20HouseAssembly amendment 1 offered by Representative Jacque
2011-09-08HousePublic hearing held
2011-08-29HouseRead first time and referred to committee on Criminal Justice and Corrections
2011-08-29HouseIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback