WI AB231 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-5)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-5)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 71.63 (6) (n) 1. and 2.; to renumber and amend 71.63 (6) (n) (intro.); to amend 71.05 (6) (b) 28. e., 71.05 (6) (b) 28. f., 71.05 (6) (b) 32. b., 71.05 (6) (b) 32. c., 71.05 (6) (b) 33. b., 71.05 (6) (b) 33. c., 71.05 (6) (b) 35. c., 71.05 (6) (b) 35. d., 71.05 (6) (b) 36. c., 71.05 (6) (b) 36. d., 71.05 (6) (b) 37. c., 71.05 (6) (b) 37. d., 71.05 (6) (b) 38. c., 71.05 (6) (b) 38. d., 71.05 (6) (b) 39. c., 71.05 (6) (b) 39. d., 71.05 (6) (b) 40. c., 71.05 (6) (b) 40. d., 71.05 (6) (b) 41. c., 71.05 (6) (b) 41. d., 71.05 (6) (b) 42. c., 71.05 (6) (b) 42. d. and 71.05 (6) (b) 43. f.; and to create 71.05 (1) (h) of the statutes; Relating to: an income tax exemption for cash tips paid to an employee. (FE)
Title
An income tax exemption for cash tips paid to an employee. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-03-05 | House | Public hearing held |
2019-05-23 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-05-22 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2019-05-22 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab231 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/AB231.pdf |