WI AB231 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 20-6)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to repeal 978.001 (1p) and 978.11; to amend 13.093 (2) (a), 16.971 (9), 16.971 (10), 230.33 (1), 978.03, 978.045 (1g), 978.045 (1r) (bm) (intro.), 978.045 (2), 978.05 (9) and 978.12 (1) (c); and to create 13.0967, 15.77, 20.548, 20.923 (4) (f) 7x., 20.923 (6) (hs), 227.112, 227.19 (3) (em), 230.08 (2) (qp), 978.001 (1b), (1d) and (1n), 978.003, 978.004 and 978.005 of the statutes; Relating to: creation of a prosecutor board and a state prosecutors office and making appropriations. (FE)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Creation of a prosecutor board and a state prosecutors office and making appropriations. (FE)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-20 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and passed (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-28SenateFailed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
2018-03-13SenateRead first time and referred to committee on Government Operations, Technology and Consumer Protection
2018-02-21SenateReceived from Assembly
2018-02-20HouseOrdered immediately messaged
2018-02-20HouseRepresentatives Barca and Vruwink added as coauthors
2018-02-20HouseRead a third time and passed, Ayes 95, Noes 0
2018-02-20HouseRules suspended
2018-02-20HouseOrdered to a third reading
2018-02-20HouseAssembly Substitute Amendment 1 adopted
2018-02-20HouseRead a second time
2018-02-15HouseMade a special order of business at 1:05 PM on 2-20-2018 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 26
2018-02-15HouseReferred to committee on Rules
2018-02-15HouseReport passage as amended recommended by Committee on Government Accountability and Oversight, Ayes 9, Noes 0
2018-02-15HouseReport Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Government Accountability and Oversight, Ayes 8, Noes 0
2018-01-31HouseExecutive action taken
2018-01-23HouseAssembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Tusler
2017-12-20HousePublic hearing held
2017-12-20HouseRepresentative Brostoff added as a coauthor
2017-06-06HouseFiscal estimate received
2017-04-19HouseFiscal estimate received
2017-04-13HouseFiscal estimate received
2017-04-13HouseFiscal estimate received
2017-04-13HouseFiscal estimate received
2017-04-12HouseRead first time and referred to Committee on Government Accountability and Oversight
2017-04-12HouseIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback