WI AB230 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to consolidate, renumber and amend 173.12 (3) (a) and (b) of the statutes; Relating to: animals believed to have been involved in fighting or being held as evidence.
Title
Animals believed to have been involved in fighting or being held as evidence.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-08 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2013-10-31 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2013-10-31 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security, Ayes 7, Noes 0 |
2013-10-31 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security, Ayes 7, Noes 0 |
2013-10-29 | House | Executive action taken |
2013-10-02 | House | Public hearing held |
2013-09-24 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Spiros |
2013-06-04 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |
2013-06-04 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2013/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab230 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2013/REG/AB230.pdf |