WI AB23 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 17-0)
Status: Failed on May 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-17 - Failed to pass notwithstanding the objections of the Governor pursuant to Joint Rule 82
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 17-0)
Status: Failed on May 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-17 - Failed to pass notwithstanding the objections of the Governor pursuant to Joint Rule 82
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 252.02 (5m) and 252.03 (2m) of the statutes; Relating to: prohibiting certain government officials from mandating vaccination against the 2019 novel coronavirus.
Title
Prohibiting certain government officials from mandating vaccination against the 2019 novel coronavirus.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-23 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and passed (Y: 60 N: 33 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - House - Assembly: Decision of the Chair upheld (Y: 59 N: 36 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - House - Assembly: Decision of the Chair upheld (Y: 59 N: 36 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-17 | House | Failed to pass notwithstanding the objections of the Governor pursuant to Joint Rule 82 |
2022-05-17 | House | Placed on calendar 5-17-2022 pursuant to Joint Rule 82 (2)(a) |
2021-05-06 | House | Placed on calendar 5-11-2021 by Committee on Rules |
2021-05-06 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2021-04-23 | House | Report vetoed by the Governor on 4-23-2021 |
2021-04-21 | House | Presented to the Governor on 4-21-2021 by directive of the Speaker |
2021-04-15 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 4-15-2021 |
2021-04-14 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Read a second time |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Placed on calendar 4-14-2021 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2021-03-23 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2021-03-23 | House | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 60, Noes 33, Paired 2 |
2021-03-23 | House | Rules suspended |
2021-03-23 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2021-03-23 | House | Decision of the Chair upheld, Ayes 59, Noes 36 |
2021-03-23 | House | Decision of the Chair appealed |
2021-03-23 | House | Point of order that Assembly Amendment 2 not germane under Assembly Rule 54 (3)(f) well taken |
2021-03-23 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 offered by Representatives Riemer, S. Rodriguez, Anderson, Andraca, Baldeh, Billings, Bowen, Brostoff, Cabrera, Conley, Considine, Doyle, Drake, Emerson, Goyke, Haywood, Hebl, Hesselbein, Hintz, Hong, McGuire, B. Meyers, Milroy, Moore Omokunde, L. Myers, Neubauer, Ohnstad, Ortiz-Velez, Pope, Shankland, Shelton, Sinicki, Snodgrass, Spreitzer, Stubbs, Subeck, Vining and Vruwink |
2021-03-23 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 adopted |
2021-03-23 | House | Read a second time |
2021-03-19 | House | Representative Steffen added as a coauthor |
2021-03-17 | House | Placed on calendar 3-23-2021 by Committee on Rules |
2021-03-17 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2021-03-17 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Constitution and Ethics, Ayes 6, Noes 3 |
2021-03-17 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Constitution and Ethics, Ayes 6, Noes 3 |
2021-03-10 | House | Executive action taken |
2021-03-09 | House | Representative Dittrich added as a coauthor |
2021-03-09 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Thiesfeldt |
2021-03-08 | House | Representative Cabral-Guevara added as a coauthor |
2021-03-05 | House | Representative Wichgers added as a coauthor |
2021-03-03 | House | Public hearing held |
2021-03-02 | House | Representatives Loudenbeck and Plumer added as coauthors |
2021-03-01 | House | Representatives Edming and Tittl added as coauthors |
2021-02-26 | House | Representative Ramthun added as a coauthor |
2021-02-12 | House | Representative Allen added as a coauthor |
2021-01-29 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Constitution and Ethics |
2021-01-29 | House | Introduced |