WI AB23 | 2011 | September Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on December 13 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-12-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on December 13 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-12-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 71.09 (11) (d), 71.78 (1m) (a), 71.83 (1) (a) 1., 71.83 (1) (a) 1m., 71.83 (1) (a) 2., 71.83 (1) (a) 3., 71.83 (1) (a) 4., 71.83 (3) (a), 72.06, 73.01 (4) (e) 2., 76.05 (2), 76.14, 76.28 (6) (b), 76.39 (3), 76.645 (2) (intro.), 77.60 (2) (intro.), 77.60 (3), 77.60 (4), 77.61 (5) (a), 77.76 (3), 77.76 (3m), 77.76 (3p), 77.95, 77.982 (2), 77.982 (3), 77.991 (2), 77.9941 (5), 77.9951 (2), 77.9964 (2), 77.9972 (2), 78.68 (3), 78.68 (4), 139.11 (4) (a), 139.25 (3), 139.25 (4), 139.38 (6), 139.82 (6), 227.12 (3), 227.41 (1), 227.41 (3), 227.41 (4), 227.483 (1) and 803.08; and to create 73.015 (3), 73.16, 77.61 (6), 125.52 (8), 125.53 (3), 125.58 (5), 227.12 (4) and 227.41 (5) of the statutes; relating to: various duties of the Department of Revenue, including issuing declaratory judgments, conducting audits and assessments, asserting liability, allowing claims for refunds, awarding the costs of litigation, prohibiting browsing of returns and claims, imposing penalties related to a taxpayer's negligence, requiring the exercise of rule-making authority, and providing a penalty. (FE)
Title
Various duties of the Department of Revenue, including issuing declaratory judgments, conducting audits and assessments, asserting liability, allowing claims for refunds, awarding the costs of litigation, prohibiting browsing of returns and claims, imposing penalties related to a taxpayer's negligence, requiring the exercise of rule-making authority, and providing a penalty. (FE)
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-13 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | |
2011-11-03 | Laid on the table | |
2011-11-02 | Fiscal estimate received | |
2011-10-31 | Referred to Calendar 11-1-2011 pursuant to Assembly Rule 93 | |
2011-10-31 | Report passage as amended recommended by joint committee on Finance, Ayes 12, Noes 3 | |
2011-10-31 | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by joint committee on Finance, Ayes 15, Noes 0 | |
2011-10-26 | Assembly amendment 1 offered by joint committee on Finance | |
2011-10-26 | Executive action taken | |
2011-10-25 | Withdrawn from committee on Ways and Means and referred to joint committee on Finance pursuant to Assembly Rule 42 (3)(c) | |
2011-10-25 | Public hearing held | |
2011-10-18 | Senators Grothman, Darling, Lasee and Galloway added as a cosponsors | |
2011-10-18 | Representatives Kooyenga, Endsley, Kestell, Knodl, Craig, Kaufert, LeMahieu, Marklein, A. Ott, Mursau, Vos, Jacque and Litjens added as coauthors | |
2011-10-18 | Senator Zipperer added as a cosponsor | |
2011-10-18 | Representative Strachota added as a coauthor | |
2011-10-18 | Read first time and referred to committee on Ways and Means | |
2011-10-18 | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2011/proposals/se1/asm/bill/ab23 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2011/SE1/AB23.pdf |