WI AB227 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Passed on May 19 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-21 - Published 6-1-2010
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Passed on May 19 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-21 - Published 6-1-2010
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 450.19 of the statutes; relating to: directing the Pharmacy Examining Board to create a program to monitor the dispensing of prescription drugs and requiring the exercise of rule-making authority.
Title
Directing the Pharmacy Examining Board to create a program to monitor the dispensing of prescription drugs and requiring the exercise of rule-making authority.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-21 | Published 6-1-2010 | |
2010-05-19 | Report approved by the Governor on 5-18-2010. 2009 Wisconsin Act 362 | |
2010-05-13 | Presented to the Governor on 5-13-2010 | |
2010-04-27 | Report correctly enrolled | |
2010-04-15 | Action ordered immediately messaged | |
2010-04-15 | Senate amendment 1 concurred in | |
2010-04-15 | Received from Senate amended and concurred in as amended (Senate amendment 1 adopted) | |
2010-04-13 | Ordered immediately messaged | |
2010-04-13 | Read a third time and concurred in as amended, Ayes 31, Noes 2 | |
2010-04-13 | Rules suspended | |
2010-04-13 | Ordered to a third reading | |
2010-04-13 | Senate amendment 1 adopted | |
2010-04-13 | Read a second time | |
2010-04-08 | Placed on calendar 4-13-2010 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) | |
2010-03-17 | Available for scheduling | |
2010-03-17 | Report concurrence as amended recommended by joint committee on Finance, Ayes 16, Noes 0 | |
2010-03-17 | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by joint committee on Finance, Ayes 16, Noes 0 | |
2010-03-17 | Report introduction of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by joint committee on Finance, Ayes 16, Noes 0 by joint committee on Finance | |
2010-03-16 | Executive action taken | |
2010-02-10 | Referred to joint committee on Finance by committee on Senate Organization pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e) | |
2010-01-27 | Available for scheduling | |
2010-01-27 | Report concurrence recommended by committee on Health, Health Insurance, Privacy, Property Tax Relief, and Revenue, Ayes 7, Noes 0 | |
2010-01-27 | Executive action taken | |
2010-01-20 | Public hearing held | |
2009-09-24 | Read first time and referred to committee on Health, Health Insurance, Privacy, Property Tax Relief, and Revenue | |
2009-09-23 | Received from Assembly | |
2009-09-22 | Ordered immediately messaged | |
2009-09-22 | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 89, Noes 6 | |
2009-09-22 | Refused to refer to committee on Personal Privacy, Ayes 43, Noes 52 | |
2009-09-16 | Ordered to a third reading | |
2009-09-16 | Assembly substitute amendment 1 adopted | |
2009-09-16 | Read a second time | |
2009-09-10 | Placed on calendar 9-16-2009 by committee on Rules | |
2009-09-08 | Referred to committee on Rules | |
2009-09-08 | Report passage as amended recommended by committee on Public Health, Ayes 7, Noes 0 | |
2009-09-08 | Report Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adoption recommended by committee on Public Health, Ayes 7, Noes 0 | |
2009-08-25 | Executive action taken | |
2009-08-20 | Assembly substitute amendment 1 offered by Representative Sherman | |
2009-07-28 | Public hearing held | |
2009-07-24 | Assembly amendment 1 offered by Representative Sherman | |
2009-05-15 | Fiscal estimate received | |
2009-05-14 | Fiscal estimate received | |
2009-04-23 | Read first time and referred to committee on Public Health | |
2009-04-23 | Introduced |