WI AB225 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 40-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-08 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-08 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 11.09, 11.38 (2) (c), 67.05 (3) (a) 2. and 67.05 (3) (a) 4.; to renumber and amend 6.97 (3) (b), 9.20 (4), 11.01 (16) (b), 11.05 (8) and 67.05 (5) (b); to amend 5.02 (19), 5.052 (3) (a) to (e), 5.15 (6) (b), 5.35 (6) (a) 2., 5.90 (1), 6.15 (2) (bm), 6.29 (2) (b), 6.34 (2), 6.34 (3) (a) 8., 6.36 (1) (a), 6.36 (2) (a), 6.36 (2) (c), 6.55 (2) (b), 6.55 (2) (c) 1., 6.79 (2) (a), 6.79 (2) (d), 6.82 (1) (a), 6.86 (1) (b), 7.08 (1) (c), 7.15 (2) (d), 7.30 (2) (a) and (b), 7.41 (3) (intro.) and (a), 7.51 (3) (a), 7.52 (8), 8.05 (3) (d), 8.05 (3) (e), 8.06, 8.50 (intro.), 8.50 (1) (a), 8.50 (1) (c), 8.50 (2) (a), 8.50 (4) (f) 1. and 2., 9.01 (1) (ag) 1m., 9.01 (1) (b) (intro.), 9.01 (1) (b) 1., 9.10 (2) (b), 9.10 (2) (d), 11.01 (16) (intro.), 11.01 (16) (a) (intro.), 11.05 (3) (c), 11.06 (1) (intro.), 11.06 (1) (j), 11.12 (1) (d), 11.12 (3), 11.12 (4), 11.16 (1) (d), 11.29 (1), 11.38 (title) and (1) (a) 1., 11.38 (1) (b), 11.38 (8) (b), 13.625 (1) (c) (intro.), 17.02 (1), 17.18, 24.66 (3) (b), 24.66 (4), 32.72 (1), 38.15 (1), 38.16 (3) (br) 1., 59.08 (7) (b), 59.605 (3) (a) 1., 60.62 (2), 60.74 (5) (b), 61.187 (1), 61.46 (1), 62.09 (1) (a), 62.13 (6) (b), 64.03 (1), 64.39 (3), 66.0101 (8), 66.0211 (1), 66.0213 (6), 66.0215 (2), 66.0217 (3) (b), 66.0217 (7) (a) 3., 66.0217 (7) (d), 66.0219 (4) (b), 66.0225 (2), 66.0227 (3), 66.0305 (6) (b), 66.0307 (4) (e) 2., 66.0602 (4) (a), 66.0619 (2m) (b), 66.0815 (1) (c), 66.0921 (2), 66.1103 (10) (d), 66.1113 (2) (g), 66.1113 (2) (h), 67.05 (3) (f), 67.05 (4), 67.05 (5) (a), 67.05 (6a) (a) 2. a., 67.05 (6m) (b), 67.10 (5) (b), 67.12 (12) (e) 2., 67.12 (12) (e) 5., 82.03 (2) (b), 86.21 (2) (a), 92.11 (4) (c), 117.20 (2), 119.48 (4) (b), 119.48 (4) (c), 119.49 (1) (b), 119.49 (2), 120.13 (intro.), 121.91 (3) (a), 197.04 (1) (b), 197.04 (2), 197.10 (2) and 198.19 (1); to repeal and recreate 11.01 (16) (a) 1.; and to create 5.02 (6m) (g), 6.34 (3) (a) 12., 6.79 (3) (c), 6.86 (1) (bb), 6.87 (6d), 7.51 (2) (cm), 8.065, 8.50 (4) (bm), 11.01 (11g) and (11r), 11.01 (16) (b) 1., 11.05 (11g), 11.06 (1g), 11.25 (4), 11.33 (2m) and 11.38 (1) (a) 4. to 7. of the statutes; Relating to: various changes in the campaign finance laws; exemption of certain electors from the requirement to present proof of identification when voting in an election; identifying documentation to establish proof of residency for voter registration; recording the type of identifying document provided as proof of residence; limiting the times for voting by absentee ballot in person; the method of reporting election returns by municipalities; fees for election recounts; the method of recounting votes cast with automatic tabulating equipment; residency of election officials; recall petition requirements; the procedure for recounting ballots when electors voting in person are required to sign the poll list and fail to do so; challenging an elector's registration during recount proceedings; witness addresses on absentee ballot certificates; nominees submitted by the Government Accountability Board candidate committee; securing ballot containers; party representation for election officials serving at polling places; and scheduling of referendums. (FE)
Title
Various changes in the campaign finance laws; exemption of certain electors from the requirement to present proof of identification when voting in an election; identifying documentation to establish proof of residency for voter registration; recording the type of identifying document provided as proof of residence; limiting the times for voting by absentee ballot in person; the method of reporting election returns by municipalities; fees for election recounts; the method of recounting votes cast with automatic tabulating equipment; residency of election officials; recall petition requirements; the procedure for recounting ballots when electors voting in person are required to sign the poll list and fail to do so; challenging an elector's registration during recount proceedings; witness addresses on absentee ballot certificates; nominees submitted by the Government Accountability Board candidate committee; securing ballot containers; party representation for election officials serving at polling places; and scheduling of referendums. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-08 | Senate | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2014-01-15 | Senate | LRB correction (Assembly Substitute Amendment 1) |
2013-12-18 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2013-12-13 | Senate | Representative Jacque withdrawn as a coauthor |
2013-08-19 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Elections and Urban Affairs |
2013-07-02 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2013-06-27 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2013-06-14 | Senate | Representative Neylon withdrawn as a coauthor |
2013-06-13 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2013-06-12 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2013-06-12 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2013-06-12 | House | Rules suspended |
2013-06-12 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2013-06-12 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adopted |
2013-06-12 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adopted |
2013-06-12 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representatives Bernier and Berceau |
2013-06-12 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adopted |
2013-06-12 | House | Read a second time |
2013-06-12 | House | Representatives Craig, Jagler, J. Ott and Stroebel withdrawn as coauthors |
2013-06-11 | House | Representatives Hutton, Sanfelippo and Tittl withdrawn as coauthors |
2013-06-10 | House | Placed on calendar 6-12-2013 by Committee on Rules |
2013-06-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2013-06-10 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Campaigns and Elections, Ayes 8, Noes 1 |
2013-06-10 | House | Report Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Campaigns and Elections, Ayes 8, Noes 1 |
2013-06-10 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Campaigns and Elections, Ayes 9, Noes 0 |
2013-06-10 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Committee on Campaigns and Elections |
2013-06-10 | House | Executive action taken |
2013-06-10 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representatives Vos, Mason, Stone, Kessler and Berceau |
2013-06-04 | House | Public hearing held |
2013-05-31 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Campaigns and Elections |
2013-05-31 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2013/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab225 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2013/REG/AB225.pdf |