WI AB223 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-7)
Status: Passed on March 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-25 - Published 3-23-2024
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-7)
Status: Passed on March 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-25 - Published 3-23-2024
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber 118.07 (1); and to create 118.07 (1) (b) of the statutes; Relating to: maintaining a supply of usable opioid antagonist at a school. (FE)
Title
Maintaining a supply of usable opioid antagonist at a school. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-25 | House | Published 3-23-2024 |
2024-03-25 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 3-22-2024. 2023 Wisconsin Act 194 |
2024-03-18 | House | Presented to the Governor on 3-18-2024 |
2024-02-21 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 2-21-2024 |
2024-02-20 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Rules suspended to give bill its third reading |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Read a second time |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Senator Carpenter added as a cosponsor |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Placed on calendar 2-20-2024 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Senator Agard added as a cosponsor |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee on Education and rereferred to committee on Senate Organization pursuant to Senate Rule 46(2)(c) |
2023-11-21 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Education |
2023-11-15 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2023-11-14 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2023-11-14 | House | Representative Rozar added as a coauthor |
2023-11-14 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2023-11-14 | House | Rules suspended |
2023-11-14 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2023-11-14 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adopted |
2023-11-14 | House | Read a second time |
2023-11-13 | House | Representative Gustafson added as a coauthor |
2023-11-08 | House | Placed on calendar 11-14-2023 by Committee on Rules |
2023-11-08 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2023-11-08 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Education, Ayes 14, Noes 0 |
2023-11-08 | House | Report Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Education, Ayes 14, Noes 0 |
2023-11-08 | House | Executive action taken |
2023-11-01 | House | Public hearing held |
2023-10-19 | House | Representative Bare added as a coauthor |
2023-09-20 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Zimmerman |
2023-06-22 | House | Representative Ratcliff added as a coauthor |
2023-06-14 | House | Representative Jacobson added as a coauthor |
2023-06-06 | House | Representative Joers added as a coauthor |
2023-04-24 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2023-04-20 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Education |
2023-04-20 | House | Introduced |