WI AB223 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-9)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-9)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 71.05 (1) (an), 71.05 (6) (b) 4. (intro.), 71.05 (6) (b) 54. (intro.) and 71.83 (1) (a) 6.; and to create 71.05 (1) (ad) of the statutes; Relating to: exempting from taxation the pension benefits of certain federal employees. (FE)
Title
Exempting from taxation the pension benefits of certain federal employees. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2022-02-15 | House | Representative Haywood added as a coauthor |
2022-02-01 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2022-02-01 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Ways and Means, Ayes 13, Noes 0 |
2021-10-12 | House | Executive action taken |
2021-07-14 | House | Representative Mursau added as a coauthor |
2021-06-08 | House | Public hearing held |
2021-06-08 | House | Representative Dittrich added as a coauthor |
2021-05-06 | House | Representative Oldenburg added as a coauthor |
2021-04-01 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-03-31 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2021-03-31 | House | Introduced |