WI AB223 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 121.90 (2) (am) 1.; and to create 20.255 (2) (bq) and 121.134 of the statutes; Relating to: supplemental state aid for consolidated school districts and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
Supplemental state aid for consolidated school districts and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-02-04 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2020-02-04 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Education, Ayes 11, Noes 2 |
2019-07-11 | House | Executive action taken |
2019-06-20 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-06-13 | House | Public hearing held |
2019-05-21 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Education |
2019-05-21 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab223 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/AB223.pdf |