WI AB223 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on February 4 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-04 - Published 2-5-2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on February 4 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-04 - Published 2-5-2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 893.43, 893.54 (intro.) and 893.54 (1) and (2); to amend 893.52; and to create 893.43 (2) and 893.54 (2m) of the statutes; Relating to: statutes of limitation on claims involving property damage and on claims arising from a motor vehicle accident and covered by a motor vehicle insurance policy.
Title
Statutes of limitation on claims involving property damage and on claims arising from a motor vehicle accident and covered by a motor vehicle insurance policy.
Sponsors
Rep. John Spiros [R] | Rep. Joe Sanfelippo [R] | Rep. Cody Horlacher [R] | Rep. David Murphy [R] |
Rep. Scott Allen [R] | Sen. Frank Lasee [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-11-03 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and passed (Y: 61 N: 36 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-04 | House | Published 2-5-2016 |
2016-02-04 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 2-4-2016. 2015 Wisconsin Act 133 |
2016-02-03 | House | Presented to the Governor on 2-3-2016 |
2016-01-28 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 1-28-2016 |
2016-01-28 | House | LRB correction |
2016-01-21 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Read a second time |
2016-01-19 | Senate | Placed on calendar 1-20-2016 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2016-01-19 | Senate | Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2015-11-05 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2015-11-05 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2015-11-04 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2015-11-03 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2015-11-03 | House | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 61, Noes 36 |
2015-11-03 | House | Rules suspended |
2015-11-03 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2015-11-03 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 adopted |
2015-11-03 | House | Read a second time |
2015-10-28 | House | Placed on calendar 11-3-2015 by Committee on Rules |
2015-10-13 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2015-10-13 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Judiciary, Ayes 4, Noes 3 |
2015-10-13 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Judiciary, Ayes 7, Noes 0 |
2015-10-01 | House | Executive action taken |
2015-09-17 | House | Public hearing held |
2015-09-11 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Spiros |
2015-05-19 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2015-05-19 | House | Introduced |