WI AB223 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-28 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-28 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 938.317; to amend 756.06 (2) (d), 938.243 (1) (c), 938.255 (1) (d), 938.30 (2), 938.31 (2), 938.31 (4) and 938.355 (4) (b); and to create 938.235 (6), 938.243 (1) (g), 938.317 (2) and 938.355 (4) (c) of the statutes; relating to: the right to a trial by jury for a juvenile for whom the petitioner has reserved the right to recommend placement in the Serious Juvenile Offender Program or in a juvenile correctional facility beyond the age of majority.
Title
The right to a trial by jury for a juvenile for whom the petitioner has reserved the right to recommend placement in the Serious Juvenile Offender Program or in a juvenile correctional facility beyond the age of majority.
Sponsors
Rep. Terese Berceau [D] | Rep. Frederick Kessler [D] | Sen. John Lehman [D] | Rep. Sandra Pasch [D] |
Sen. Kelda Roys [D] | Sen. Lena Taylor [D] | Rep. Robert Turner [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-28 | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | |
2010-04-27 | Fiscal estimate received | |
2010-04-20 | Available for scheduling | |
2010-04-20 | Report concurrence recommended by committee on Judiciary, Corrections, Insurance, Campaign Finance Reform, and Housing, Ayes 5, Noes 0 | |
2010-04-20 | Executive action taken | |
2010-04-19 | Public hearing held | |
2010-04-16 | Read first time and referred to committee on Judiciary, Corrections, Insurance, Campaign Finance Reform, and Housing | |
2010-04-16 | Received from Assembly | |
2010-04-15 | Ordered immediately messaged | |
2010-04-15 | Read a third time and passed | |
2010-04-15 | Rules suspended | |
2010-04-15 | Ordered to a third reading | |
2010-04-15 | Read a second time | |
2010-04-13 | Made a special order of business at 11:07 A.M. on 4-15-2010 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 22 | |
2010-03-16 | Referred to committee on Rules | |
2010-03-16 | Report passage recommended by committee on Corrections and the Courts, Ayes 12, Noes 0 | |
2010-03-11 | Executive action taken | |
2010-02-24 | Public hearing held | |
2010-02-22 | Fiscal estimate received | |
2009-08-06 | Fiscal estimate received | |
2009-05-06 | Fiscal estimate received | |
2009-05-06 | Fiscal estimate received | |
2009-05-05 | Fiscal estimate received | |
2009-04-23 | Read first time and referred to committee on Corrections and the Courts | |
2009-04-23 | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2009/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab223 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2009/REG/AB223.pdf |