WI AB222 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 26-10)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 26-10)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 20.435 (1) (fg); and to create 20.435 (1) (fg) of the statutes; Relating to: grants for creation of rural wellness facilities and programs and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
Grants for creation of rural wellness facilities and programs and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2017-05-10 | House | Representative Shankland added as a coauthor |
2017-05-03 | House | Public hearing held |
2017-04-27 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-04-10 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Rural Development and Mining |
2017-04-10 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2017/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab222 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2017/REG/AB222.pdf |