WI AB221 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-8)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-8)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 71.05 (1) (ae) (intro.), 71.05 (1) (an), 71.05 (6) (b) 4. and 71.83 (1) (a) 6.; and to create 71.05 (1) (ad) of the statutes; Relating to: exempting from taxation the pension benefits of certain retired federal employees. (FE)
Title
Exempting from taxation the pension benefits of certain retired federal employees. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-03-26 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2020-03-26 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Ways and Means, Ayes 11, Noes 0 |
2020-03-26 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Ways and Means, Ayes 11, Noes 0 |
2019-10-02 | House | Executive action taken |
2019-09-23 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Ohnstad |
2019-09-12 | House | Public hearing held |
2019-09-12 | House | Representatives Ramthun, Kulp and Allen added as coauthors |
2019-07-30 | House | Representative Knodl added as a coauthor |
2019-07-17 | House | Representative Mursau added as a coauthor |
2019-05-31 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-05-22 | House | Senator Wanggaard added as a cosponsor |
2019-05-21 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2019-05-21 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab221 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/AB221.pdf |