WI AB220 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 32-3)
Status: Passed on November 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-08 - Published 11-6-2021
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 32-3)
Status: Passed on November 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-08 - Published 11-6-2021
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 115.385 (4) and 118.57 (1) of the statutes; Relating to: providing information about educational options offered in a school district.
Title
Providing information about educational options offered in a school district.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-08 | House | Published 11-6-2021 |
2021-11-08 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 11-5-2021. 2021 Wisconsin Act 83 |
2021-11-02 | House | Presented to the Governor on 11-2-2021 |
2021-10-04 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 10-4-2021 |
2021-09-28 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2021-09-28 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2021-09-28 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in |
2021-09-28 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2021-09-28 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2021-09-28 | Senate | Read a second time |
2021-09-24 | Senate | Placed on calendar 9-28-2021 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2021-09-24 | Senate | Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2021-06-22 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2021-06-22 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2021-06-22 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2021-06-22 | House | Rules suspended |
2021-06-22 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2021-06-22 | House | Read a second time |
2021-06-16 | House | Placed on calendar 6-22-2021 by Committee on Rules |
2021-06-16 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2021-06-16 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Workforce Development, Ayes 10, Noes 0 |
2021-06-02 | House | Executive action taken |
2021-05-25 | House | Representative Drake added as a coauthor |
2021-05-05 | House | Public hearing held |
2021-03-31 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Workforce Development |
2021-03-31 | House | Introduced |