WI AB220 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-0)
Status: Introduced on May 17 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-09-13 - LRB correction
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to repeal 23.33 (1) (jo) 5., 23.335 (1) (zgm) 5., 30.50 (10m) (e), 340.01 (50m) (e), 350.01 (10v) (e), 885.235 (1) (d) 5., 939.22 (33) (e), 961.11 (4g), 961.14 (4) (t), 961.32 (2m), 961.38 (1n), 961.41 (1) (h), 961.41 (1m) (h), 961.41 (1q), 961.41 (3g) (e), 961.571 (1) (a) 7., 961.571 (1) (a) 11. e., 961.571 (1) (a) 11. k. and L. and 967.055 (1m) (b) 5.; to renumber 30.681 (1) (bn) and subchapter VI (title) of chapter 50 [precedes 50.90]; to renumber and amend 23.33 (4c) (a) 5., 23.335 (12) (a) 5., 23.335 (12) (b) 5., 30.681 (1) (d), 108.133 (1) (a), 115.35 (1), 346.63 (1) (d), 350.101 (1) (e), 961.01 (14) and 961.34; to amend 20.435 (6) (jm), 23.33 (1) (jo) 1., 23.33 (4c) (a) 4., 23.33 (4c) (b) 3., 23.33 (4c) (b) 4. a., 23.33 (4c) (b) 4. b., 23.33 (4p) (d), 23.33 (13) (b) 1., 23.33 (13) (b) 2., 23.33 (13) (b) 3., 23.33 (13) (b) 4., 23.33 (13) (e), 23.335 (1) (zgm) 1., 23.335 (12) (a) 4., 23.335 (12) (b) 3., 23.335 (12) (b) 4., 23.335 (12) (i), 23.335 (23) (c) 1., 23.335 (23) (c) 2., 23.335 (23) (c) 3., 23.335 (23) (c) 4., 30.50 (10m) (a), 30.681 (1) (b) (title), 30.681 (1) (bn) (title), 30.681 (1) (c), 30.681 (2) (b) (title), 30.681 (2) (c), 30.681 (2) (d) 1. a., 30.681 (2) (d) 1. b., 30.684 (4), 30.80 (6) (d), 49.148 (4) (a), 49.45 (23) (g) 5., 49.79 (1) (b), 50.56 (3), 51.49 (1) (d), 59.54 (25) (title), 59.54 (25) (a) (intro.), 66.0107 (1) (bm), 77.52 (13), 77.53 (10), 111.35 (2) (e), 114.09 (2) (bm) 1. (intro.), 114.09 (2) (bm) 4., 146.40 (1) (bo), 146.81 (1) (L), 146.997 (1) (d) 18., 157.06 (11) (i), 289.33 (3) (d), 340.01 (50m) (a), 343.06 (1) (d), 343.10 (5) (a) 1., 343.10 (5) (a) 2., 343.10 (8) (intro.), 343.12 (7) (a) 9., 343.12 (7) (a) 11., 343.16 (2) (b), 343.16 (5) (a), 343.30 (1p), 343.30 (1q) (c) 1. (intro.), 343.30 (1q) (d) 1., 343.30 (1q) (h), 343.305 (2), 343.305 (3) (a), 343.305 (3) (am), 343.305 (3) (ar) 1., 343.305 (3) (b), 343.305 (5) (b), 343.305 (5) (d), 343.305 (6) (a), 343.305 (7) (a), 343.305 (8) (b) 2. bm., 343.305 (8) (b) 2. d., 343.305 (8) (b) 4m. a., 343.305 (8) (b) 5. b., 343.305 (8) (b) 6. b., 343.305 (9) (a) 5. a., 343.305 (9) (a) 5. c., 343.305 (9) (am) 5. a., 343.305 (9) (am) 5. c., 343.305 (9) (d), 343.305 (10) (c) 1. (intro.), 343.305 (10) (d), 343.305 (10) (em), 343.307 (1) (d), 343.307 (2) (e), 343.31 (1) (am), 343.31 (2), 343.315 (2) (a) 2., 343.315 (2) (a) 5., 343.315 (2) (a) 6., 343.315 (2) (bm) 2., 343.32 (2) (bj), 343.38 (1) (d) 2., 343.44 (1) (a), 343.44 (1) (b), 344.576 (2) (b), 346.63 (1) (b), 346.63 (2) (a) 2., 346.63 (2) (b) 1., 346.63 (2) (b) 2., 346.637, 346.65 (2m) (a), 346.65 (2q), 346.93 (1), 346.935 (1), 346.935 (2), 346.935 (3), 349.02 (2) (b) 4., 349.03 (2m), 349.06 (1m), 350.01 (10v) (a), 350.101 (1) (d), 350.101 (2) (c), 350.101 (2) (d) 1., 350.101 (2) (d) 2., 350.104 (4), 350.11 (3) (a) 1., 350.11 (3) (a) 2., 350.11 (3) (a) 3., 350.11 (3) (a) 4., 350.11 (3) (d), 609.83, 767.41 (5) (am) (intro.), 767.451 (5m) (a), 885.235 (1) (d) 1., 885.235 (1g) (intro.), 885.235 (1m), 885.235 (4), 895.047 (3) (a), 905.04 (4) (f), 939.22 (33) (a), 940.09 (1m) (a), 940.09 (1m) (b), 940.09 (2) (a), 940.09 (2) (b), 940.25 (1m), 940.25 (2) (a), 940.25 (2) (b), 941.20 (1) (bm), 961.41 (1r), 961.41 (3g) (c), 961.41 (3g) (d), 961.41 (3g) (em), 961.47 (1), 961.48 (3), 961.48 (5), 961.49 (1m) (intro.), 961.571 (1) (a) 11. (intro.), 967.055 (1) (a), 967.055 (1) (b), 967.055 (1m) (b) 1., 967.055 (2) (a), 971.365 (1) (a), 971.365 (1) (b), 971.365 (1) (c) and 971.365 (2); and to create 20.115 (7) (ge), 20.435 (1) (gq), 20.435 (1) (jm), 20.566 (1) (bn), 23.33 (1) (k), 23.33 (4c) (a) 2g., 23.33 (4c) (a) 3g., 23.33 (4c) (a) 5. b., 23.33 (4c) (b) 2n., 23.33 (4c) (b) 4. c., 23.335 (1) (zLg), 23.335 (12) (a) 2g., 23.335 (12) (a) 3m., 23.335 (12) (a) 5. b., 23.335 (12) (b) 2g., 23.335 (12) (b) 5. b., 30.50 (13p), 30.50 (13t), 30.681 (1) (b) 1g., 30.681 (1) (bn) 2., 30.681 (1) (d) 2., 30.681 (2) (b) 1g., 30.681 (2) (d) 1. c., subchapter VI of chapter 50 [precedes 50.80], 66.0414, 77.54 (69), 94.56, 100.145, 108.02 (18r), 108.04 (5m), 108.133 (1) (a) 2., 111.32 (9m), 111.32 (11m), 115.35 (1) (a) 6., 121.02 (1) (L) 8., subchapter IV of chapter 139 [precedes 139.97], 146.44, 146.46, 157.06 (11) (hm), 340.01 (66m), 343.305 (5) (dm), 346.63 (1) (d) 2., 346.63 (2) (b) 3., 346.63 (2p), 350.01 (21g), 350.101 (1) (bg), 350.101 (1) (cg), 350.101 (1) (e) 2., 350.101 (2) (bg), 350.101 (2) (d) 3., 632.895 (16p), 767.41 (5) (d), 767.451 (5m) (d), 885.235 (1) (e), 885.235 (1g) (ag), 885.235 (1g) (cg), 885.235 (1L), 939.22 (39g), 940.09 (1) (bg), 940.09 (1) (dg), 940.09 (1g) (bg), 940.09 (1g) (dg), 940.09 (2) (c), 940.25 (1) (bg), 940.25 (1) (dg), 940.25 (2) (c), 941.20 (1) (bg), subchapter VIII of chapter 961 [precedes 961.70] and 973.016 of the statutes; Relating to: marijuana possession, regulation of marijuana distribution and cultivation, medical marijuana, operating a motor vehicle while under the influence of marijuana, requiring the exercise of rule-making authority, granting rule-making authority, making an appropriation, and providing a penalty. (FE)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Marijuana possession, regulation of marijuana distribution and cultivation, medical marijuana, operating a motor vehicle while under the influence of marijuana, requiring the exercise of rule-making authority, granting rule-making authority, making an appropriation, and providing a penalty. (FE)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-09-13HouseLRB correction
2019-08-16HouseFiscal estimate received
2019-06-19HouseFiscal estimate received
2019-06-17HouseFiscal estimate received
2019-06-17HouseFiscal estimate received
2019-06-17HouseFiscal estimate received
2019-06-13HouseFiscal estimate received
2019-06-11HouseFiscal estimate received
2019-06-10HouseFiscal estimate received
2019-06-04HouseCommissioner of Insurance report received pursuant to s.601.423(2), Wisconsin Statutes
2019-05-17HouseRead first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety
2019-05-17HouseIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback