WI AB22 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 32-13)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 32-13)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 185.07 (1), 185.13 (1) and 185.13 (4); and to create 185.03 (13), 185.07 (4) and 185.13 (7) of the statutes; Relating to: member meetings, bylaws, and emergency powers of a cooperative.
Title
Member meetings, bylaws, and emergency powers of a cooperative.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2021-02-16 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-02-11 | House | Placed on calendar 2-16-2021 by Committee on Rules |
2021-02-11 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2021-02-11 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Financial Institutions, Ayes 9, Noes 0 |
2021-02-11 | House | Executive action taken |
2021-02-10 | House | Public hearing held |
2021-01-29 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Financial Institutions |
2021-01-29 | House | Introduced |