WI AB22 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on November 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-20 - Published 11-21-2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on November 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-20 - Published 11-21-2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 38.04 (4) (e) 8. and 343.71 (5) (h) of the statutes; Relating to: driver education instruction on human trafficking. (FE)
Title
Driver education instruction on human trafficking. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-20 | House | Published 11-21-2019 |
2019-11-20 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 11-20-2019. 2019 Wisconsin Act 27 |
2019-11-15 | House | Presented to the Governor on 11-15-2019 by directive of the Speaker |
2019-11-04 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-10-11 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 10-11-2019 |
2019-10-08 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2019-10-08 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2019-10-08 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in |
2019-10-08 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2019-10-08 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2019-10-08 | Senate | Read a second time |
2019-10-04 | Senate | Placed on calendar 10-8-2019 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2019-10-04 | Senate | Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2019-08-29 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2019-08-29 | Senate | Report concurrence recommended by Committee on Universities, Technical Colleges, Children and Families, Ayes 7, Noes 0 |
2019-08-27 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Universities, Technical Colleges, Children and Families |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2019-05-15 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2019-05-15 | House | Representative Hesselbein added as a coauthor |
2019-05-15 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2019-05-15 | House | Rules suspended |
2019-05-15 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2019-05-15 | House | Read a second time |
2019-05-09 | House | Placed on calendar 5-15-2019 by Committee on Rules |
2019-04-29 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2019-04-29 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Colleges and Universities, Ayes 13, Noes 0 |
2019-04-11 | House | Representative James added as a coauthor |
2019-03-28 | House | Executive action taken |
2019-03-27 | House | Representative Stubbs added as a coauthor |
2019-03-21 | House | Representative Dittrich withdrawn as a coauthor |
2019-03-14 | House | Public hearing held |
2019-03-12 | House | Representative Shankland added as a coauthor |
2019-03-05 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-02-27 | House | Representative Cabrera added as a coauthor |
2019-02-22 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-02-12 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Colleges and Universities |
2019-02-12 | House | Introduced |