WI AB22 | 2011 | September Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on December 13 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-12-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on December 13 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-12-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 895.529 of the statutes; relating to: the duty of care owed to trespassers.
Title
The duty of care owed to trespassers.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-13 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | |
2011-11-03 | Laid on the table | |
2011-11-01 | Referred to Calendar 11-3-2011 pursuant to Assembly Rule 93 | |
2011-11-01 | Report passage as amended recommended by committee on Judiciary and Ethics, Ayes 7, Noes 1 | |
2011-11-01 | Report Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adoption recommended by committee on Judiciary and Ethics, Ayes 7, Noes 1 | |
2011-10-27 | Executive action taken | |
2011-10-25 | Assembly substitute amendment 1 offered by Representative Kuglitsch | |
2011-10-25 | Representative Jacque added as a coauthor | |
2011-10-21 | Public hearing held | |
2011-10-18 | Senator Zipperer added as a cosponsor | |
2011-10-18 | Representatives Williams, Farrow and August added as coauthors | |
2011-10-18 | Senator Galloway added as a cosponsor | |
2011-10-18 | Representative Kuglitsch added as a coauthor | |
2011-10-18 | Read first time and referred to committee on Judiciary and Ethics | |
2011-10-18 | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2011/proposals/se1/asm/bill/ab22 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2011/SE1/AB22.pdf |