WI AB217 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Engrossed on September 24 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 24 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 457.08 (4) (c) (intro.) of the statutes; Relating to: practice requirement for licensure as a clinical social worker.
Title
Practice requirement for licensure as a clinical social worker.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | Senate | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2016-02-05 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2016-02-05 | Senate | Report concurrence recommended by Committee on Health and Human Services, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2015-09-28 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Health and Human Services |
2015-09-24 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2015-09-24 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2015-09-24 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2015-09-24 | House | Rules suspended |
2015-09-24 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2015-09-24 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adopted |
2015-09-24 | House | Read a second time |
2015-09-22 | House | Placed on calendar 9-24-2015 by Committee on Rules |
2015-06-18 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2015-06-18 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on State Affairs and Government Operations, Ayes 14, Noes 0 |
2015-06-18 | House | Report Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on State Affairs and Government Operations, Ayes 14, Noes 0 |
2015-06-16 | House | Executive action taken |
2015-06-11 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative T. Larson |
2015-05-27 | House | Public hearing held |
2015-05-14 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs and Government Operations |
2015-05-14 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2015/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab217 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2015/REG/AB217.pdf |