WI AB217 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 18-3)
Status: Passed on April 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-12 - Published 4-23-2012
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 18-3)
Status: Passed on April 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-12 - Published 4-23-2012
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber 946.70 (1); to amend 946.70 (title) and 946.70 (2); and to create 946.70 (1) (b), (c) and (d) of the statutes; relating to: impersonating certain officials and providing a penalty. (FE)
Title
Impersonating certain officials and providing a penalty. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-12 | House | Published 4-23-2012 |
2012-04-10 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 4-9-2012. 2011 Wisconsin Act 276 |
2012-04-05 | House | Presented to the Governor on 4-5-2012 |
2012-03-27 | House | Report correctly enrolled |
2012-03-06 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2012-03-06 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2012-03-06 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in |
2012-03-06 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2012-03-06 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2012-03-06 | Senate | Read a second time |
2012-03-05 | Senate | Placed on calendar 3-6-2012 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2012-02-28 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2012-02-28 | Senate | Report concurrence recommended by committee on Judiciary, Utilities, Commerce, and Government Operations, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2012-02-28 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2012-02-23 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2012-02-22 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2011-10-26 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Judiciary, Utilities, Commerce, and Government Operations |
2011-10-26 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2011-10-25 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2011-10-25 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2011-10-25 | House | Rules suspended |
2011-10-25 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2011-10-25 | House | Read a second time |
2011-10-20 | House | Placed on calendar 10-25-2011 by committee on Rules |
2011-10-07 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2011-10-07 | House | Report passage recommended by committee on Criminal Justice and Corrections, Ayes 8, Noes 0 |
2011-10-06 | House | Executive action taken |
2011-09-22 | House | Public hearing held |
2011-09-07 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2011-08-23 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2011-08-18 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2011-08-11 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Criminal Justice and Corrections |
2011-08-11 | House | Introduced |